Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
L. W. Weidert Farms Inc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Miller, Kenneth Allen, against Vfo Walla Walla, Llc, represented by Harlington, Jillian, in the jurisdiction of Walla Walla County, WA, . Walla Walla County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2020 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWalla Walla County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice & stipulation |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.