Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Marquez, Jesus, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Verhulp, Mistee R, against Xyz Corporation, Does 1-10, Jane, Does 1-10, John, Packers Sanitation Services Inc Ltd, represented by Umberger, Rodney L., Jr, in the jurisdiction of Walla Walla County, WA, . Walla Walla County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 15, 2020 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWalla Walla County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice and w/out costs |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense def packers sanitation |
|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Substitution of Counsel Mistee R Verhulp |
|
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance def packers sanitation services inc |
|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.