Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case in the jurisdiction of Wahkiakum County, WA, . Wahkiakum County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2017 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWahkiakum County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certification - Criminal and Juvenile- McAllister |
|
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certification - Daniel Mellen |
|
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certification Daniel Mellen- Juvenile |
|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certification of B. Berkenmeier |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certification Mayrie Grimm - Juvenile |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certification Mayrie Grimm CrR 3.1 |
|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certification McAllister - Adults |
|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certification McAllister - Juvenile |
|
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certification - Baldwin |
|
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certification - Heywood - Juvenile |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.