Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Barlcays Bank Delaware, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Rahlfs, Roger Edward, against Alderman, Jane Doe, Alderman, Lawson C., And The Marital Community Comprised Therof, in the jurisdiction of Wahkiakum County, WA, . Wahkiakum County, WA Superior Courts with Heidi L. Heywood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHeidi L. Heywood Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 29, 2016 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWahkiakum County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Heywood, Heidi L |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit - D. Craven, Deputy Clerk |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Stayed Bankruptcy 4: CASE STAYED BANKRUPTCY; |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons 3: SUMMONS; |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Complaint 2: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE; |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Information Cover Sheet 1: CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.