Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Jones, Bradley Boswell, against Bryan, Ricky, Bryan, Janet H W And Their Martial Com, in the jurisdiction of Wahkiakum County, WA, . Wahkiakum County, WA Superior Courts with Heidi L. Heywood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHeidi L. Heywood Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2016 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWahkiakum County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Heywood, Heidi L |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerks Order of Dismissal | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
C Civil SHOW CAUSE HEARING |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing Stricken In Court NonAppearance 10: HEARING STRICKEN:IN COURT NONAPPEAR; |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduled 5: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; 12-14-2015; SHOW CAUSE HEARING; |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 9: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET(RE-NOTE); 01-04-2016C; SHOW CAUSE HEARING; |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested -: CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; PARTIES WILL RE-NOTE HEARING; |
|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 8: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.