Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Delmar, Angela Marie filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Wahkiakum County, WA, . Wahkiakum County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2015 |
CategorySxp Sexual Assault Protection |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWahkiakum County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 12: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order 10: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; JUDGE PRO TEM; |
|
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Receipts 11: RECEIPT FROM WCSO; |
|
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order for Sexual Assault Protection 9: ORDER FOR SEXUAL ASSAULT PROTECTION; ******AMENDED EXPIRATION DATE******; |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Receipts 8: RECEIPT FROM WCSO; |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 7: MOTION HEARING; JUDGE PRO TEM-FAUBION; |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order for Sexual Assault Protection 6: ORDER FOR SEXUAL ASSAULT PROTECTION; |
|
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 5: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Receipts 4: RECEIPT FROM WCSO; |
|
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order 3: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; COMMISSIONER TIMOTHY M. HANIGAN; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.