Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Blondin, Kevin Gravelet filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Wahkiakum County, WA, . Wahkiakum County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2015 |
CategorySxp Sexual Assault Protection |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWahkiakum County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt for Exhibits or Unopened Depositions 35: RECEIPT FOR EXHIBIT/UNOPENED DEPOS; |
|
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Return of Exhibits and or Unopen 34: STIP&OR RET EXHBTS UNOPNED DEPOSTNS; |
|
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Invoice Voucher 33: INVOICE VOUCHER ATTY FEES HEYWOOD; |
|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order 32: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; COMMISSIONER TIMOTHY M. HANIGAN; |
|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order for Withdrawal of Attorney -: ORDER FOR WITHDRWL OF ATTORNEY; |
|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Attorney Fees 31: ORDER SETTING ATTORNEY FEES; |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion 30: MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMP. AND W/D; OF COURT APPOINTED ATTORNEY; |
|
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Return on Subpoena -: RETURN ON SUBPOENA - B. TAWATER; |
|
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Return on Subpoena -: RETURN ON SUBPOENA - G. HOWELL; |
|
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 29: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.