Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kaiser, Debbie M, Kaiser, Bruno J, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Nelson, David Allen, against Pacific Custom Home Packages Inc, Pacific Sierra Corporation, represented by Friedrich, Alexander A., in the jurisdiction of Wahkiakum County, WA, . Wahkiakum County, WA Superior Courts with Heidi L. Heywood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHeidi L. Heywood Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2020 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWahkiakum County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Heywood, Heidi L |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerks Order of Dismissal | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Unclaimed - E. Motley |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Heywood, Heidi L |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and order to dismiss defendant developers Surety & Indemnity Co. only; affidavit re: facsimile/e-mail signatures |
|
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial 2 DAY NON-JURY TRIAL Judge: Goelz, Douglas E |
|
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice to strike trial of June 14th and 15th 2017 |
|
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Hanigan, Timothy M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.