Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ochoa-Rutherford, Marta, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Ammons, Darrel S., Jr, against Cowlitz County, Washington, represented by Justice, John Edward, in the jurisdiction of Wahkiakum County, WA, . Wahkiakum County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2014 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWahkiakum County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order 25: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation -: STIPULATION; |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 24: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduled -: NOTICE STRIKING AND RESETTING; 11-16-2015; ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT; |
|
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Defense Respondent Requested -: HEARING CANCELLED:DEF/RESP REQUEST; |
|
November 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 23: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
November 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Memorandum -: MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF SMJ; |
|
November 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Reply 22: REPLY OF DEF; |
|
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduled 14: NOTICE STRIKING AND RESETTING; 10-05-2015; ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.