Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Bailey, Kent Wade, Rahlfs, Roger Edward, against Tietje, Eileen L, Tietje, John Doe, in the jurisdiction of Wahkiakum County, WA, . Wahkiakum County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 04, 2014 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWahkiakum County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Application for Writ of Garnishment |
|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 21: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 20: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: WELLS FARGO BANK , NFN; |
|
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application 19: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 18: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 17: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application 16: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: BANK OF AMERICA , NFN; |
|
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 15: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.