Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Carlson, Gregg T., Carlson, Paula J., filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case against Estate Of Gilbertsen, Gary L, Gilbertsen, Kayrene, Gilbertsen, Kayrene Personal Rep Of Estate Of Def02, in the jurisdiction of Wahkiakum County, WA, . Wahkiakum County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2014 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWahkiakum County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order 12: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated 11: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - STIPULATED; |
|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
XP Ex Parte Matters STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Note - Accounting -: EXPARTE FEE RC'D; 30.00; |
|
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Note for Calendar -: NOTE FOR CALENDAR; 05-04-2015XP; STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; |
|
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Return of Service 9: RETURN OF SERVICE - DECLARATION; K. GILBERTSON; |
|
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Return of Service 10: RETURN OF SERVICE - DECLARATION; ESTATE OF G. GILBERTSEN; |
|
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer 8: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; |
|
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 7: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.