Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kantonen, Kelley, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Scuderi, Joseph, against Auge, Gloria A, Auge, Richard H, Brown, Chris M, Brown, Lawrence A, Hutchison, Bertha A, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Assignment for Trial Setting
Judge: Zipp, Allyson S |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings of Default, and Default Judgment |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Plaintiff |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Publication | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings Authorizing Service by Publication |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.