Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Green, Vanessa, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carr, Harold D., against The Standard Fire Insurance Company, represented by Demass, Stacy Lynn Reynee, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Carol Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarol Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Proposed Dismissal Order |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Arbitration | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Arbitration Award | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Assignment for Trial Setting
Judge: Murphy, Carol |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Transferring to Civil Arbitration | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Assignment for Arbitration Setting | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Arbitration Setting |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.