Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Goussev, Evgeniy, Mckee, Michael, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Ard, Joel Bernard, against General Motors Company, General Motors Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Carol Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarol Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 09, 2021 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Assignment for Trial Setting
Judge: Murphy, Carol |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Petition for Removal to US District Court | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Summons | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.