Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hidden Creek Homeowners Association, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Johns, Michael Wayne, against Internal Revenue Service, New Residential Mortgage Llc, Presley, Dana E, Presley, Yvette, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Sharonda D. Amamilo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSharonda D. Amamilo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2021 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Petition to Amend Complaint |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Motion to Amend Complaint to Substitute Defendant Judge: Zipp, Allyson S |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint |
|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Michael W Johns |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Amend Complaint to Subsitute Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.