Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lightfoot, Darian, Lightfoot, Kaisa, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Modern Solutions, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Indu Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIndu Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerks Order of Dismissal | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Striking Hearing | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Assignment for Trial Setting
Judge: Thomas, Indu |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition To Waive Service |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Type of Motion not Specified Judge: Price, Erik D |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.