Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kanam, Kurt, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case against Fletcher, Mathew, Greene, Dean Linda Sheryl, State Bar Of Michigan, University Of Michigan State University College Of Law, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Mary Sue Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary Sue Wilson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2021 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerks Order of Dismissal | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Striking Hearing | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Assignment for Trial Setting
Judge: Wilson, Mary Sue |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.