Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Kim, Musong, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Younglove, Edward Earl, Iii, against La Croix, Jeffery, Naberly Inc, represented by Scuderi, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with James J. Dixon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames J. Dixon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2021 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Striking Hearing | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Assignment for Trial Setting
Judge: Egeler, Anne E |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement and Auth for Clerk to Strike Trial Date | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response Scheduling Questionnaire |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial
Judge: Dixon, James J |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference
Judge: Dixon, James J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.