Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Impact Public Schools, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case against State Charter School Commission, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Carol Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarol Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryAlr Administrative Law Review |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Index Pages 497-559 |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Assignment for Trial Setting
Judge: Murphy, Carol |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Consolidated Case | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Consolidating Cases | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Deadline for Filing Agency Record |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing to Extend Deadline; Without Oral Argument Judge: Murphy, Carol |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.