Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Broom, William N, Jr, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Carr, Harold D., against North Property Investments Llc, Stephens, Parker, represented by Longshore, Jodi Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Indu Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIndu Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 5 days Judge: Thomas, Indu |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference
Judge: Thomas, Indu |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Schedule | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Assignment for Trial Setting
Judge: Thomas, Indu |
|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury 12 Person |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.