Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Stroble, Sharon, Hall, Martha, filed a(n) Inj Injunction case represented by Davis, Claire Loebs, against State Fish And Wildlife, represented by Dona, Amy Jeanne, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryInj Injunction |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Assignment for Trial Setting
Judge: Price, Erik D |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition Reconsideration |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reconsideration Via Zoom at 9:40 Judge: Wilson, Mary Sue |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response Respondent's to Motion for Reconsideration |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Re Civil Motion |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.