Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Beato, Anthony M filed a(n) Cpo Civil Protection Order case in the jurisdiction of Stevens County, WA, . Stevens County, WA Superior Courts with Jessica Taylor Reeves presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJessica Taylor Reeves Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2023 |
CategoryCpo Civil Protection Order |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStevens County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Report Fulcrum Interchance Compliance Report Dated June 17 2023 |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Parenting Plan Copy |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Radzimski, Lech |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Protection Expires 2/8/24 |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence
Judge: Reeves, Jessica T |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Reeves, Jessica T |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Reissuing Temporary Protection Order DV 2/8/2023 @1:30pm |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence
Judge: Reeves, Jessica T |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.