Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brentlinger, Roy William, Jr, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Webster, Thomas Franklin, against Way, Bill, Way, John Doe, Way, Linda M, represented by Roberts, Richard Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Stevens County, WA, . Stevens County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 29, 2022 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStevens County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Monasmith, Patrick A |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice Stipulated |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel Alice Morales-Galvez withdrawing; Richard P Roberts appearing; effective 1/26/23 |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Firm Name, Phone, Fax Change |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.