Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Payne, Heather Lee Ann filed a(n) Cpo Civil Protection Order case in the jurisdiction of Stevens County, WA, . Stevens County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2022 |
CategoryCpo Civil Protection Order |
Last RefreshedSeptember 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationStevens County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Service | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Trageser, Timothy |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Anti-Harassment @ 9AM Judge: Trageser, Timothy |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Protection | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Other Character Reference |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Service | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition Motion to Modify | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
JIS Check Confidential Document Cover Sheet JABS Reports |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.