Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Crockett, Shawn D, Estate Of Charles Merlin Crockett, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Hulten, Krystal Tate, against And All Other Persons Or Parties Unknown Claiming Right, Title, Estate, Lien, Or Interest In The Real Estate, Bryant, Clyde David, Moore, Barry G., Riley, Anthony Ray, represented by Johnson, Matthew David, in the jurisdiction of Stevens County, WA, . Stevens County, WA Superior Courts with Lech Radzimski presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLech Radzimski Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2022 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationStevens County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Radzimski, Lech |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Default | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason
Judge: Reeves, Jessica T |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Summons by Publication Judge: Reeves, Jessica T |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Radzimski, Lech |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Publication for Service on Defendent Barry G. Moore |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings Order Directing Service of Defendant by Publication |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Serve by Publication of Summons; 3/14/23 @9am |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.