Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Johnston, Shawna Marlene filed a(n) Cpo Civil Protection Order case in the jurisdiction of Stevens County, WA, . Stevens County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 21, 2022 |
CategoryCpo Civil Protection Order |
Last RefreshedSeptember 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationStevens County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Vulnerable Adult Judge: Trageser, Timothy |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Trageser, Timothy |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Continuance Review 9/15/22 @1:30pm |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Vulnerable Adult Protection Order @ 9AM Judge: Trageser, Timothy |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion To Release APS Report |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Continue | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Amended |
|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Trageser, Timothy |
|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Modifying Terminating Terms of Protective Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.