Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Morales, Amy, Morales, Armando, Morales, Kaylin, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Myers, Michael David, against Valley School District, represented by Mcfarland, Michael Early, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Stevens County, WA, . Stevens County, WA Superior Courts with Lech Radzimski presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLech Radzimski Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2022 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStevens County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Radzimski, Lech |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated RE: Only Armando Morales |
|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Radzimski, Lech |
|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Geoffrey Swindler |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Consent To Appoint Of GAL |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Reappearance |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Attorneys Claim of Lien | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer To Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.