Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Salvio, Jane Elizabeth, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Miller, Allen T., against Carpenter, Gary Bradley, Carpenter Company, represented by Waite, Tyler Scott, in the jurisdiction of Stevens County, WA, . Stevens County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2021 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationStevens County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Radzimski, Lech |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment 9:30 AM; Lukins and Anis Confirming 1/26/21 Judge: Radzimski, Lech |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Radzimski, Lech |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Continuance Summary Judgment 2-1-21 @ 9:30 AM |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment 10AM - Hrg Confirmed Ready by Lukins & Annis on 1/19/21 Judge: Radzimski, Lech |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.