Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Stevens County Washington, Ex Rel Tim Rasmussen, Tim Rasmussen, Prosecuting Attorney Of Stevens County, Wa, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Ahrend, George M, against Dashiell, Donald L, Mccart, Wesley Lewis, Parker, Steven Lynn, Travelers Surety And Casualty Company Of America, United States Fire Insurance Company, (total of 5) See All represented by Startzel, Todd R., in the jurisdiction of Stevens County, WA, . Stevens County, WA Superior Courts with Charnelle M. Bjelkengren presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharnelle M. Bjelkengren Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 21, 2019 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStevens County, WA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice Original |
|
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Restitution Original |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Restitution to defs Dahiell, McCart and Parker; $130,326.25-SC Homelessness Funds; $56,879.03-SC Current Exp. Gen. Gov. Fnd. |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Summary Judgment | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Summary Judgment in favor of Defs Dashiell, McCart, and Parker (no Pre/Post Jdgmt Interest) |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment ORIGINAL Judgment & Judgment Summary signed by court on 02/17/23 |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.