Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Nupp, Bruce Edward, Ii filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Stevens County, WA, . Stevens County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2019 |
CategoryHar Unlawful Harassment |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStevens County, WA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing Stricken In Court NonAppearance
Judge: Nielson, Allen C |
|
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing MT to Modify NCO Judge: Nielson, Allen C |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing MT to Modify NCO 3-21-19 @ 09:00 AM |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Uncontested Resolution Hearing
Judge: Reeves, Jessica T |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Modifying Terminating Terms of Protective Order DENIED-EXP 6/14/20 |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing MT to Modify/Rescind DV NCO Judge: Nielson, Allen C |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petition Motion to Modify Modify/ Rescind DV No-Contact Order 2-28-19 @ 09:00 AM |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason
Judge: Nielson, Allen C |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Motion to Modify No-Contact Order Judge: Nielson, Allen C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.