Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mayer, Richard, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Phelps, Douglas Dwight, against Airway Heights Corrections Ctr, Beerbahn, Jared, City Of Airway Heights, Dept Of Corrections, Hammond, Steven, (total of 11) See All represented by Brooks, Jacob Earl, Clark, Megan Christine, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Tony D. Hazel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTony D. Hazel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment
Judge: Hazel, Tony D |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support DOUGLAS PHELPS |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Shorten Time | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit MEGAN C CLARK |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply IN SUPPORT OF MT FOR SUMM JUDGMENT |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Continue ORAL AGRUMENT |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply CITY OF AIRWAY HEIGHTS & ALBERT TRIPP / IN SUPPORT OF MT FOR SUMM JDGMNT |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit DOUGLAS D PHELPS |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response TO MT FOR SUMM JDGMNT |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Petition FOR SUMMARY JDGMNT IN PART Judge: Hazel, Tony D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.