Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Grenning, Neil, filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case against Washington State Department Of Corrections, represented by Dibble, Candie M, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Rachelle E. Anderson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRachelle E. Anderson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryPra Public Records Act |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter JA FOR JDG MCKAY |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence FROM NEIL GRENNING |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Statement OF INTENT NOT TO FILE A VERATIM REP OF PROCEEDINGS |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Designation of Clerks Papers | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Letter | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Perfection Notice from Court of Appeals | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter FROM SUPREME CRT |
|
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order ON PLAINTIFF'S COST BILL Judge: Anderson, Rachelle E |
|
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S COST BILL |
|
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S COST BILL Judge: Anderson, Rachelle E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.