Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Johnson, Todd Lee, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Harris, Mark James, against Carrillo, Jose M, City Of Spokane Valley, Criswell, Griffin E, Kulman, Tyler S, Spokane County, (total of 6) See All represented by Yakely, Heather, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Maryann C. Moreno presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaryann C. Moreno Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 06, 2021 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice
Judge: Moreno, Maryann C |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss complaint without Prejudice and without Cost to Any Party Pursuant to CR 41(a)(1)(B) - M. Harris Judge: Moreno, Maryann C |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 01-28-2022 @ 3 pm |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion STRIKE MOTION |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Association of Counsel | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule 01/21/22 @ 8:30 AM Judge: Moreno, Maryann C |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order Order Rescheduling Case Status Conference Date Judge: Moreno, Maryann C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.