Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hansen, Diane, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Rosentrater, Eowen, against City Of Spokane, Diamond Parking Inc, Spokane Seventy Three, Inc, represented by Haman, Michael L., in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Tony D. Hazel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTony D. Hazel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2021 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule
Judge: Hazel, Tony D |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice OF PENDIND DISM OF CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE Judge: Hazel, Tony D |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: NOTICE OF PENDING DISMISSAL OF CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE Judge: Hazel, Tony D |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: CIVIL CASE SCHEDULE ORDER Judge: Hazel, Tony D |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Email RE STATUS CONF |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: COURT'S EMAIL Judge: Hazel, Tony D |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Status Conference 5/19/23 @ 8:30 AM / 408 Judge: Hazel, Tony D |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE STATUS CONFERENCE DATE Judge: McKay, Julie M |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.