Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Estate Of David Lee Hurd, Hurd, Martha L, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Layman, John Randall, against Gill, Curtis J, Lubbe, Dieter F, Newport Community Hospital, Newport Health Center, Pend Oreille Co Public Hospital District #1, (total of 7) See All represented by Beaudoin, Ryan Marshall, Louvier, Markus William, Lovell, Alexandra Morgan, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with John O. Cooney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn O. Cooney Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryMed Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Cooney, John O |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice - R. Beaudoin Judge: Cooney, John O |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order DISMISSING CORPORATE NEGILGENCE CLAIM AGAINST PEND OREILLE COUNTY PUBLIC HOSPITAL & NEWPORT COMM. HOSPITAL Judge: Cooney, John O |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Disclosure DR. DIETER LUBBE'S REBUTTAL WITNESS |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Amending Case Schedule
Judge: Cooney, John O |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Continuance of Trial Date STIPULATION Judge: Cooney, John O |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order Amended Civil Case Schedule Order (TR 1/8/24 PT 12/15/23 @9:00) - Court Judge: Cooney, John O |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order Stipulation and Order of Trial Continuance (1/8/24) - J. Galloway Judge: Cooney, John O |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Partial Summary Judgment
Judge: Cooney, John O |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.