Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Loe, Montey, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by George, Gregory Michael, against Esparza, Martin, Navigators Insurance, Nowcrowd Inc, represented by Harrison, Frank Stuart, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Harold D. Clarke, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHarold D. Clarke, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Mail Returned Unclaimed | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S CR 41 MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE Judge: Polin, Marla L |
|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order ON CR 41 MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE Judge: Polin, Marla L |
|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED>> ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S CR 41 MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE Judge: Polin, Marla L |
|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings DSM |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Memorandum IN SUPPORT |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Litigant & DEPOSIT INTO CLERKS REGISTRY & DISBURSE & EXONERATE BOND Judge: Polin, Marla L |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED>> STIPULATION AND ODER AUTHORIZING TENDER, DISBURSEMENT, AND EXONERATION OF BOND, RESERVATION OF RIGHTS OF SURETY, AND DISMISSAL Judge: Polin, Marla L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.