Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jackson, Cynthia L, Jackson, Robert, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Spruance, H. Douglas, Iii, against Arnold, John, Uber Technologies Inc, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Michael P. Price presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael P. Price Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE Judge: Price, Michael P |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice
Judge: Price, Michael P |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF DISMISSAL |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule
Judge: Fennessy, Timothy B |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule 01/14/2022 @ 8:30 AM Judge: Price, Michael P |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE STATUS CONFERENCE DATE Judge: Price, Michael P |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.