Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Waggoner, Jeffrey, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Glanzer, Ezra Tyrone, against C & S Automotive, Fuentes, Amber R, Fuentes, Carlos A, Western Surety Co, represented by Reynolds, Dalton James, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Charnelle M. Bjelkengren presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharnelle M. Bjelkengren Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: STIPULATIN AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PRESENTED BY: REYNOLDS Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendants List of Witnesses | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule
Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: CSO(PT-8/12/2022 @ 9 AM, TD-8/22/2022 @ 9 AM) Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.