Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Doe, I, filed a(n) Inj Injunction case represented by Montgomery, John, against Perala, Davin, Spokane Regional Emergency Commission, represented by Mcaloon, Laura Debacker, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Julie M. McKay presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulie M. McKay Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2021 |
CategoryInj Injunction |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal
Judge: McKay, Julie M |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Minutes
Judge: Hazel, Tony D |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Hazel, Tony D |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Protective Order
Judge: Hazel, Tony D |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Signed: Order on Show Cause Granting Protective Order Judge: Hazel, Tony D |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice NO OBJECTION |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.