Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ebf Partners Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Walsh, Patricia Ann, against Global Assets Supply Llc, Wildman, Shatel Monique, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with John P. Stine presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn P. Stine Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 18, 2021 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment Against Garnishee Defendant
Judge: Stine, John P |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment
Judge: Ressa, Michelle L |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Default
Judge: Ressa, Michelle L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.