Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Malubay, Nicole, Malubay, Steven, Mulubay, Steven, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Levy, Alicia Rae, against Millsap, Brandon, Millsap'S Lanscaping Inc, The Cincinatti Insurance Company, represented by Louvier, Markus William, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Tony D. Hazel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTony D. Hazel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Hazel, Tony D |
|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: ORDER TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE; -LEVY; Judge: Hazel, Tony D |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Minutes
Judge: Hazel, Tony D |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition
Judge: Hazel, Tony D |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Hazel, Tony D |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit OF POSTING |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing AMENDED 10-29-2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.