Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Baker, Sandra, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carney, Janelle Marie, against Frank Gurney Inc, Gurney, Frank, Membrey, Neil David, Standard Traffic Control Inc, represented by Goehler, Barry J, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order PRESENTED BY: B. GOEHLER SIGNED: STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Witness List PLAINTIFFS |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Amending Case Schedule
Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order CHANGE TRIAL DATE TO 7/18/22 Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion TO CHANGE TRIAL DATE |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: AMENDED CSO(PT-7/8/2022 @ 9AM,TD-7/18/2022 9AM) Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: ORDER CHANGING TRIAL DATE; PRESENTED BY: GOEHLER Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury 12 Person |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.