Case Last Refreshed: 5 hours ago
Thomas Halvorson Md, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Gagliardi, John E., against Columbia Surgical Specialists Ps, Forte, Dominic, Gilsdorf, Daniel, Hilton, Jace D, Inland Imaging Clinical Associates, (total of 8) See All represented by Beaudoin, Ryan Marshall, King, James B., Megard, Bruce W, Jr, Moore, Jennifer Lynn, Rekofke, Brian T., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts Superior with Charnelle M. Bjelkengren presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharnelle M. Bjelkengren Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2021 |
CategoryMed Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2024 |
Order STIPULATION / ALLOWING PLTF TO FILE 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT / ATTACHED Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
||
April 19, 2024 |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED>>>STIPULATION AND ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO FILR THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
||
April 11, 2024 |
Proposed Order Findings ONBSE $30 FEE NOT PD / RE: STIPULATION & OR ALLOWING 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT |
||
March 11, 2024 | Mail Returned Unclaimed | ||
March 04, 2024 |
Order Denying Motion Petition RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
||
March 04, 2024 |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED> AGREEDORDER RE PROVIDNCE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
||
March 04, 2024 |
Agreed Order RE PROTECTIVE ORDER Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
||
February 27, 2024 | Mail Returned Unclaimed | ||
February 21, 2024 |
Letter FROM JUDGE BJELKENGREN |
||
February 21, 2024 |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED> CORRESPONDENCE. Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.