Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Adamowicz, Edward, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Phelps, Douglas Dwight, against Car Wash Enterprises Inc, Thames, Steven T, represented by Greer, Robert Franklin, Ii, Lovell, Alexandra Morgan, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Annette S. Plese presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnnette S. Plese Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2021 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Plese, Annette S |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Plese, Annette S |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Finality | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Transmittal Letter Copy Filed | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal to Court of Appeals | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Courts Decision ON DEFENDANT'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT Judge: Plese, Annette S |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Summary Judgment
Judge: Plese, Annette S |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CAR WASH ENTERPRISES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT Judge: Plese, Annette S |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: COURT'S OPINION ON DEFENDANT'S SUMMARY JUDGEMENT Judge: Plese, Annette S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.