Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cummins, Alan, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Piskel, Jason Thomas, against Mwnj Inc, Tibbits, Rachel, represented by Franklin, Michael D, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 13, 2021 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Plese, Annette S |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order Court signs: Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice. Presented by Jason Piskel Judge: Plese, Annette S |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule
Judge: Plese, Annette S |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order Court signs: CSO PT: 1/13/2023 TD: 1/23/2023. Dept. 1 Judge: Plese, Annette S |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment /PLESE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.