Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Trumbull, Christina M, Trumbull, Robert V, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carpenter, Glenn Kenneth, Jr, against Jim Martin Trucking Llc, Lockwood, Timothy D, represented by Goehler, Barry J, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Charnelle M. Bjelkengren presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharnelle M. Bjelkengren Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice
Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE PRESENTED BY: GOEHLER Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule
Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: CSO(PT-12/2/2022 @ 9:00AM, TD-12/12/2022 @ 9:00AM) Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Amending Case Schedule 02-18-22 @ 8:30 AM Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: ORDER RESCHEDULING CSC DATE (2/18/2022 @ 8:30 AM) Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: ORDER RESCHEDULING CSC DATE(1/14/2022 @ 8:30 AM) Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Amending Case Schedule
Judge: Bjelkengren, Charnelle M |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.