Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
U S Bank Trust National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Loftis, Erica Taylor, against Accounts Receivable Inc, Edwards, Susan M, Edwards, Tim, Peterson, Dean, Spokane County, (total of 5) See All represented by Evans, Casey Allen, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Julie M. McKay presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulie M. McKay Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2021 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return On O/SALE AMENDED |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return On REAL PROPERTY ORDER OF SALE |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings ORDER OF EXTENDING TIME OF ORDER OF SALE ON DECREE OF FORECLOSURE |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order SIGNED: ORDER OF EXTENDING TIME OF ORDER OF SALE ON DECREE OF FORECLOSURE Judge: Polin, Marla L |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Extending TIME OF ORDER OF SALE ON DECREE OF FORECLOSURE Judge: Polin, Marla L |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion EXTEND TIME OF SALE |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice OF JUDGMENT & DECREE OF FORECLOSURE |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.