Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Klitzke, Kimm, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Moriarty, Shane Michael, against Mcelroy, Jane Doe, Mcelroy, Michael, Pacific Logging, represented by Bloomfield, Stephanie, in the jurisdiction of Snohomish County, WA, . Snohomish County, WA Superior Courts with George F. Appel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeorge F. Appel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 13, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSnohomish County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Set Trial as noted / Moriarty |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 12 person, set 3-4 days Judge: Appel, George F |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Trial Cancelled Unknown Party | |
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated
Judge: Nelson, Patricia J |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement and Auth for Clerk to Strike Trial Date | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Firm Name Change |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Trial Date | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury 12 Person |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.