Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Manneh, Aramata, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Marino, Kristina Louise, against Ahc Barber & Beauty College, Ebriama Jammeh, Jammeh, Ebriama, Jammeh, Jane Doe, Sharrett, Donald, (total of 6) See All represented by Garrison, Robert Alan, Jensen, Heather M, in the jurisdiction of Snohomish County, WA, . Snohomish County, WA Superior Courts with Susan E. Harness presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan E. Harness Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 13, 2021 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSnohomish County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated
Judge: Harness, Susan |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Arbitration | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Arbitration Award | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended Answer | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order allowing dfdts Sharrett to file amended answer to first amended complaint Judge: Nelson, Patricia J |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appointment as Arbitrator | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Proposed Arbitrators |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.