Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brann, Erick, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jones, Dax, against Bogomaz, Bogomaz, Dmitriy, Bogomaz, Jane Doe, represented by Williams, Andrew Bennett, in the jurisdiction of Snohomish County, WA, . Snohomish County, WA Superior Courts with Patricia J. Nelson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatricia J. Nelson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 06, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSnohomish County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Nelson, Patricia J |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement and Auth for Clerk to Strike Trial Date | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.